Klaassen, Robert John (CPSO#: 62471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2210
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karpinski Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klaassen ( CPSO# 62471 )
Dr. J. Karpinski ( CPSO# 62470 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital- Riverside Site
5th Floor, 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Corporation Name: R. J. Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klaassen ( CPSO# 62471 )
Dr. J. Karpinski ( CPSO# 62470 )

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Suite 2638-1
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN KLAASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAASSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1993