Klaiman, Michelle Ziva (CPSO#: 88862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: Strasberg, Michelle Ziva (used until: 06 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michaels Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: (416) 864-5669
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

True North Medical
3424 Weston Rd
North York ON  M9M 2W1
Canada
Phone: 1-888-878-3563
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ZIVA KLAIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAIMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2014