Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Klajner, Felix (CPSO#: 60826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Health Care Centre
Unit 92
130 Adelaide Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 3P5
Phone: (416) 361-6142
Fax: (416) 361-1200
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FELIX KLAJNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAJNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990