Klapwyk, Linda Anne (CPSO#: 73414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 766-2718
Fax: (416) 766-0196
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Klapwyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Klapwyk ( CPSO# 73414 )

Business Address:
Suite 507
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 766-2718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ANNE KLAPWYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAPWYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2001