Klassen, Gerhard (CPSO#: 60475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lady Minto Hospital
Box 4000
241 Eighth Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone: (705) 272-7200
Fax: 705-272-4873
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerhard Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bahamas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERHARD KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2009