Klassen, Philip Edwin (CPSO#: 60139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6053
Fax: (905) 430-4020
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 578-8130
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Klassen ( CPSO# 60139 )

Business Address:
340 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2H9
Phone Number: (416) 578-8130

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 668-5881

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP EDWIN KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1989