Klassen, Ruby Aguilar Acompanado (CPSO#: 68395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1265 Arthur Street East
Suite 303
West Arthur Building
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 622-3737
Fax: (807) 623-1969
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klassen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klassen ( CPSO# 68395 )
Dr. S. Klassen ( CPSO# 67812 )

Business Address:
303 - 1265 East Arthur Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 622-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBY AGUILAR ACOMPANADO KLASSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLASSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996