Kleider, Alexander (CPSO#: 22301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 23 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1987