Klein, Jack (CPSO#: 52553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hampton Park Plaza
Suite 200
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L6
Phone: (613) 226-9444
Fax: (613) 820-7892
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1984