Klein, Jaclyn Danielle (CPSO#: 106799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Rosenbaum, Jaclyn Danielle (used until: 07 May 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
390 Steeles Avenue West
Unit One
Thornhill ON  L4J6X2
Phone: 905-881-3984
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACLYN DANIELLE KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017