Klein, Klara Pearl (CPSO#: 25891)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. J. Klein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Klein ( CPSO# 25766 )
Dr. K. Klein ( CPSO# 25891 )

Business Address:
Colborne Family Medical Centre
612 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 673-1962

Business Address:
London Cardiac Institute
302 - 256 Pall Mall Street
London ON  N6A 5P6
Phone Number: (519) 645-0146

Business Address:
Cardiac Investigation Unit
London Health Sciences Centre - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Medical Records Location

Address: Colborne Family Medical Centre 612 Colborne St Londone ON N6B 2V2
Date Received: 11 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017