Klein, Thomas Brian (CPSO#: 58102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Unit 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone: (905) 451-4560
Fax: (905) 459-5085
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 820-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0115
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Klein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Klein ( CPSO# 58102 )

Business Address:
1 - 3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute
Suite 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS BRIAN KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988