Kleinlugtenbelt, Ydo Vincent (CPSO#: 102553)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Erasmus University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 21 Mar 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015