Klement, Giannoula (CPSO#: 65591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIANNOULA KLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEMENT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993