Klevan, Ariel (CPSO#: 84734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 700
790 Bay Street
PO Box 71
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 551-6006
Fax: (416) 551-6009
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4A, 2200 Dundas St East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Canada
Phone: 9052320720
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: 905-683-1700
Fax: 905-683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: 9057075007
Fax: 9057075008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klevan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 90867 )
Dr. A. Klevan ( CPSO# 84734 )

Business Address:
700 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 551-6006

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIEL KLEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011