Klieger-Grossmann, Chagit (CPSO#: 87663)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010