Klimaj-Balogh, Katalin (CPSO#: 94130)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2013