Klimek, Edwin Herbert (CPSO#: 51432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Queenston Street
Suite 301
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 688-2066
Fax: (905) 688-9335
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Klimek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Klimek ( CPSO# 51432 )

Business Address:
301 - 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 688-2066

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN HERBERT KLIMEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLIMEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983