Klinck, John Rutherford (CPSO#: 29981)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993