Klipitch, Oleg (CPSO#: 87014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1278 The Queensway Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 1S3
Phone: (416) 848-9795
Fax: (416) 521-7216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oleg Klipitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Klipitch ( CPSO# 87014 )

Business Address:
1278 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Z 1S3
Phone Number: (416) 848-9795

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEG KLIPITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLIPITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009