Kljenak, Diana (CPSO#: 64813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
9 New East Wing, Room 453
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street,
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5459
Fax: (416) 603-5490
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Counselling Centre
University of Toronto Mississauga
3359 Mississauga Road North
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-5255
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diana Kljenak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kljenak ( CPSO# 64813 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
9 New East Wing, Room 453
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5459

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA KLJENAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLJENAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jan 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jan 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996