Kloth, Debra Monica (CPSO#: 71075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
416 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone: (519) 675-1366
Fax: (519) 675-0875
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Debra M. Kloth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kloth ( CPSO# 71075 )

Business Address:
416 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone Number: (519) 675-1366

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 21 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA MONICA KLOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2001