Klotz, Laurence Harold (CPSO#: 30375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Urology
Room MG 408
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4673
Fax: (416) 480-6121
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klotz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Klotz ( CPSO# 30375 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Urology
MG408 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4673

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 2, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Laurence Harold
            Klotz, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Klotz to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. LAURENCE HAROLD KLOTZ
                                          ("Dr. Klotz")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Klotz, certificate of registration number 30375, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my practice and that the College is conducting an investigation
                  into the information.

            (4)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (5)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matter currently being investigated is disposed of by a panel of the
                  ICR Committee or, should allegations be referred to discipline, the
                  Discipline Committee. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (7)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to perform ureteric and renal surgery for
                        trauma cases requiring immediate operative intervention (within
                        eight [8] hours of injury) only in the presence of the general
                        surgeon on call for trauma surgery, who is prepared to assist if
                        needed. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to abide in all respects by the terms set
                        out in my agreement with Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre the
                        relevant parts of which are attached to this Undertaking at
                        Appendix "A," by which, among other things, I will not perform:
                  
                        i.    Partial nephrectomies;
                        ii.   Nephro-ureterectomies;
                        iii.  Cytoreductive nephrectomies;
                        iv.   Nephrectomies except under the conditions listed in Appendix
                              "A;"
                        v.    Retroperitoneal lymph node dissections for testicular cancer;
                        vi.   Reconstructive procedures including ureterectomies for
                              malignancy with ureteral reconstruction;
                        vii.  Radical cystectomies; and
                        viii. Open (non-robotic) prostatectomy for benign or malignant
                              disease.  
                  
                  For greater certainty, I will not perform the procedures set out in
                  section (8)(b)(i) through (viii) above anywhere that I practise medicine.
                  However, I understand that nothing in this section prevents me from
                  performing ureteric and renal surgery as necessary for trauma cases in
                  compliance with section 8(a).  
                  
            (9)   Reports from Division Head

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to have the Head of the Urology Division at
                        Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, or another person in a similar
                        position who is acceptable to the College (the "Division Head"),
                        assist in the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I have reviewed the undertaking of
                        the Division Head attached hereto as Appendix "B", and understand
                        what is required of the Division Head, including monthly reports
                        regarding my compliance and provision of any supporting
                        information.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fifteen
                        (15) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake that if any person who has given an
                        undertaking in the Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I currently practise medicine only
                        at (i) Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, (ii) Michael Garron
                        Hospital, and (iii) Can-Am HIFU (my current "Practice
                        Location(s)"). I acknowledge that at Michael Garron Hospital my
                        practice is limited to a single procedure, namely robotic-assisted
                        laparoscopic radical prostatectomies, while at Can-Am HIFU my
                        practice is limited to high-intensity focused ultrasound of the
                        prostate.  I undertake that I shall not commence practising
                        medicine at any other location without notifying the College at
                        least fourteen (14) days in advance. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Klotz, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation is being conducted into Dr. Klotz's
                        practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Klotz has
                        restricted his practice:
                  
                        *     Dr. Klotz will perform ureteric and renal surgery for trauma
                              cases requiring immediate operative intervention (within
                              eight [8] hours of injury) only in the presence of the
                              general surgeon on call for trauma surgery, who is prepared
                              to assist if needed. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Klotz will abide in all respects with terms set out in an
                              agreement with Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, by which,
                              among other things, he will not perform:
                  
                              i.    Partial nephrectomies;
                              ii.   Nephro-ureterectomies;
                              iii.  Cytoreductive nephrectomies;
                              iv.   Nephrectomies except under certain conditions listed in
                                    Appendix "A" to his undertaking;
                              v.    Retroperitoneal lymph node dissections for testicular
                                    cancer;
                              vi.   Reconstructive procedures including ureterectomies for
                                    malignancy with ureteral reconstruction;
                              vii.  Radical cystectomies; and
                              viii. Open (non-robotic) prostatectomy for benign or
                                    malignant disease.  
                  
                        Dr. Klotz will not perform the above procedures anywhere that he
                        practices medicine. This does not prevent him from performing
                        ureteric and renal surgery as necessary for trauma cases as
                        described above.
                  
                        *     Dr. Klotz will not commence practising medicine at any
                              location other than Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,
                              Michael Garron Hospital, or Can-Am HIFU without notifying the
                              College at least fourteen (14) days in advance.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information,
                  including all Chief(s) of Staff and the Division Head:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Klotz, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff, the
                  Surgeon-in-Chief and the Division Head to disclose to the College, and to
                  one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the agreement at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the provisions of the Division Head's undertaking set
                        out at Appendix "B";
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Laurence Harold Klotz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 2, 2018:

A College investigation is being conducted into Dr. Klotz’s practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Klotz has restricted his practice:

Dr. Klotz will perform ureteric and renal surgery for trauma cases requiring immediate operative intervention (within eight [8] hours of injury) only in the presence of the general surgeon on call for trauma surgery, who is prepared to assist if needed.

Dr. Klotz will abide in all respects with terms set out in an agreement with Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, by which, among other things, he will not perform:

i. Partial nephrectomies;
ii. Nephro-ureterectomies;
iii. Cytoreductive nephrectomies;
iv. Nephrectomies except under certain conditions listed in Appendix “A” to his undertaking;
v. Retroperitoneal lymph node dissections for testicular cancer;
vi. Reconstructive procedures including ureterectomies for malignancy with ureteral reconstruction;
vii. Radical cystectomies; and
viii. Open (non-robotic) prostatectomy for benign or malignant disease.

Dr. Klotz will not perform the above procedures anywhere that he practices medicine. This does not prevent him from performing ureteric and renal surgery as necessary for trauma cases as described above.

Dr. Klotz will not commence practising medicine at any location other than Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, Michael Garron Hospital, or Can-Am HIFU without notifying the College at least fourteen (14) days in advance.