Klugman, Stephen Ernest (CPSO#: 62948)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Sep 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995