Knight, Burton Walter (CPSO#: 43450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 314
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-1998
Fax: (416) 498-4518
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Burton Knight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Knight ( CPSO# 43450 )

Business Address:
314 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 498-1998

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BURTON WALTER KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1994