Knight, Gregory John (CPSO#: 59668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5715
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Knight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Knight ( CPSO# 59668 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1990