Knight, John Lincoln (CPSO#: 57965)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013