Knoefel, Frank-Dietrich (CPSO#: 64378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Montreal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 369Y
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6322 Ext. 1357
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

630 Eagleson Rd
Kanata ON  K2M 1H4
Canada
Phone: 6138780273
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Knoefel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Knoefel ( CPSO# 64378 )

Business Address:
369Y - 75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK-DIETRICH KNOEFEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOEFEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1994