Knoll, Gregory Alan (CPSO#: 62810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Room 515
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82536
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Knoll Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Knoll ( CPSO# 62810 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Room 515
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALAN KNOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOLL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990