Knott, David Charles (CPSO#: 63557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Services
Oakville Site
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4605
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES KNOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992