Knowles, Kathleen Florence (CPSO#: 29423)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 14 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2008