Knowles, Sarah Angela (CPSO#: 95283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Room C8-1144
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANGELA KNOWLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOWLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017