Knox, Katherine Barbara (CPSO#: 80453)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 02 May 2005 to 10 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2005 to 23 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2005