Ko, Dicken Shiu Chung (CPSO#: 62190)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2004