Ko, Gordon Dickman (CPSO#: 50980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Canadian Centre for Integrative
Medicine
12 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone: (905) 471-9355
Fax: (905) 471-4348
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite UG42
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4342
Fax: (416) 480-6885
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

FASTEC
2 Millstone Court
Unionville ON  L3R 7M1
Canada
Phone: 905 475-8386
Fax: 905 479-4406
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon D. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ko ( CPSO# 50980 )
Dr. A. Hum ( CPSO# 62463 )

Business Address:
Canadian Centre Integrative Medicine
12 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone Number: (905) 471-9355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON DICKMAN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983