Ko, Samuel (CPSO#: 79185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 304
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 773-0102
Fax: (416) 773-0103
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ko ( CPSO# 79185 )

Business Address:
Unit 304
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 773-0102

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009