Ko, Sang Wook (CPSO#: 68063)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sang Wook Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2005

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2005