Ko, Yoo-Joung (CPSO#: 66644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue T-Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4662
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y.J. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ko ( CPSO# 66644 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional Cancer Centre
Suite T2-044
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOO-JOUNG KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1998