Kobayashi, Jeffrey Shunji (CPSO#: 50981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: Kobayashi, Jeff Shunji (used until: 18 Mar 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Neurology Clinic-6D Atrium
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7427 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 813-6709
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 6276
Fax: (416) 753-6046
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Holland Bloorview kids rehab hospit
150 kilgour road
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4G1R8
Canada
Phone: 416 425-6220 Ext. 6276
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Kobayashi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kobayashi ( CPSO# 50981 )

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Neurology Clinic-6D Atrium
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 481-0802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY SHUNJI KOBAYASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBAYASHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983