Kobayashi, Kenneth Alan (CPSO#: 54245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bldg 315, 2nd floor
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.
1 Health Plaza
East Hanover NJ  07936-1080
United States
Phone: 862-778-6310 Ext. 1
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth A. Kobayashi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kobayashi ( CPSO# 54245 )

Business Address:
Novaritis Pharmaceuticals Corp
Building 315
2nd Floor
1 Health Plaza
East Hanover NJ  179 6-1

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre PO Box 9056 835 King Street West Kitchener, Ontario N2G 1G3
Date Received: 16 Feb 2010


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Suite 305 99 Northfield Drive East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 3P9
Date Received: 25 Nov 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 12 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN KOBAYASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBAYASHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985