Kobayashi, Tadahiro (CPSO#: 102919)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yamagata University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2015 to 13 Apr 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015