Kobeleva, Sofya (CPSO#: 83242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5489
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Kobeleva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kobeleva ( CPSO# 83242 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 746-4104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOFYA KOBELEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBELEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012