Koby, Lawrence Keith (CPSO#: 99123)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015