Koch, Bernd Richard Oskar (CPSO#: 19013)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hamburg University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 312 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 11 Jun 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008