Koch, Christine Anne (CPSO#: 69122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2122
Fax: (416) 946-4586
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Anne Koch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Koch ( CPSO# 69122 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Department of Radiation Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE KOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 21 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002