Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kocsis, Pongrac (CPSO#: 62155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
959 Dundas Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 1H2
Phone: (519) 539-5621
Fax: (519) 539-0628
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kocsis and R. Domenicone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kocsis ( CPSO# 62155 )
Dr. R. Domenicone ( CPSO# 62101 )

Business Address:
201 - 959 Dundas Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 1H2
Phone Number: (519) 539-5621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PONGRAC KOCSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCSIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991