Koczerginski, David (CPSO#: 52636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57708
Fax: (905) 494-6710
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Koczerginski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koczerginski ( CPSO# 52636 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KOCZERGINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCZERGINSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1985 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984