Koczorowska, Maria Teresa (CPSO#: 61812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B
53 Melgund Rd
Toronto ON  M5R 2A1
Phone: (416) 924-3854
Fax: (416) 924-9428
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Koczorowska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koczorowska ( CPSO# 61812 )

Business Address:
B - 53 Melgund Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2A1
Phone Number: (416) 924-3854

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Poland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA TERESA KOCZOROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCZOROWSKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994