Kodama, Ronald Takashi (CPSO#: 50982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG406
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5956
Fax: (416) 480-6934
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Kodama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kodama ( CPSO# 50982 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG406
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5956

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD TAKASHI KODAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KODAMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1986