Kodeeswaran, Tanuja (CPSO#: 67904)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2005